Case: 14-15-00699-CV
14-15-00699-CV
08/19/2015
Unknown Civil Case Type.
William Satterwhite, Jr.
Christopher Evans and Yi Zhang
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/15/2016 | Case stored | | |||||||
01/15/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
01/14/2016 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
12/21/2015 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
12/21/2015 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
11/20/2015 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
11/20/2015 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
11/05/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
11/04/2015 | Submitted | | |||||||
11/04/2015 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
11/02/2015 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
10/26/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
10/20/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
10/15/2015 | Order entered |
| |||||||
10/15/2015 | Order withdrawn | | |||||||
10/08/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
10/07/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
10/05/2015 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||||
10/05/2015 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
10/02/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
10/01/2015 | Order entered |
| |||||||
09/26/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
09/24/2015 | Dismissal letter |
| |||||||
09/24/2015 | Record Sent | | |||||||
09/22/2015 | Order entered |
| |||||||
09/22/2015 | Order entered |
| |||||||
09/17/2015 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
09/11/2015 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
09/11/2015 | Response due | | |||||||
09/10/2015 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
09/09/2015 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
09/09/2015 | Record due | | |||||||
09/03/2015 | Mediation docketing statement returned |
| |||||||
09/03/2015 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
09/03/2015 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||||
09/01/2015 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
08/31/2015 | Court fee due | | |||||||
08/19/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
08/19/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
08/19/2015 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
08/13/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
06/06/2015 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
05/12/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/15/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
01/17/2022 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Satterwhite, Jr., William | Appellant | William Satterwhite, Jr. |
Christopher Evans and Yi Zhang | Appellee | Richard Gardner Wilson |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable Judge, County Civil Court At Law No. 2
1059593
Gina Oliver