judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-336
A-336
09/08/1944
MISC PETITION
JESSIE MAE RUCKER, ET VIR
JUDGE F. P. ADAMS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/19/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/20/1944Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
10/11/1944Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
09/25/1944Response to Motion filed
09/25/1944Amendment to Motion filed
09/19/1944Brief on the Merits
09/19/1944Response to Motion filed
09/08/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Judge F. P. AdamsRespondent
Jessie Mae Rucker, et virRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information