judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WINFREY (LEONARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34799
Short Caption:WINFREY (LEONARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45023 , 45193 , 45882 , 52519 , 55070 , 55971 , 74458 , 74463 , 74570 , 74570-COA , 75094
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C124806Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08523
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34767, 34781, 34799, 34803. 99-09642
02/07/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 22. Mailed on: 02/04/00. 00-01854
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20908
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00223
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00223