judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHELLY M. SHEPARD, MD v. DAVID A. BECK, MD

Case Heading (06-98)
Case Number:06-98Case Docketed On:05/03/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:SHELLY M. SHEPARD, MD v. DAVID A. BECK, MD
Full Title:SHELLY M. SHEPARD, MD, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAVID A. BECK, MD, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShelly M. Shepard MDPatrick Dixon
AppelleeDavid A. Beck MDPaul J. Drew

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/03/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/03/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/03/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/03/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/03/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
05/12/2006Fees - Sanctions received - NOA and filed "Tender of Sanction"FeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/30/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
08/17/2006Brief - Appellee - one day late. Counsel contacted this office yesterday and indicated he was driving the brief down and he ws told if it was after 5:00 p.m. he could leave it with the law librarian. Mr. Drew did not show up until this dateBriefAppelleeFinal
08/31/2006Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential File; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2006Event - Oral argument presented before full court (Patrick Dixon for appellant; Paul Drew for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/28/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal