judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JASMINE KIARA VINCENT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1004
Short Caption:JASMINE KIARA VINCENT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD22876-09Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/19/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJasmine Kiara Vincent Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/01/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
09/21/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
09/28/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL IS GRANTED and this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED. See DC App R. 13 (b). (BY: ETW) lw
09/28/2010DISMISSED
09/29/2010RECEIVED - SR #1 - 71pgs/Tape ---7/8/10 proc.
09/29/2010RECEIVED - SR #2 - 134ps/Tape -- 7/9/10 proc. w/CD included
09/29/2010error
09/30/2010RECEIVED - record index
09/30/2010RECEIVED - record copies
10/19/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived