judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARKER (NATASHA) VS. STATE C/W 44263

Case Information: 43995
Short Caption:BARKER (NATASHA) VS. STATE C/W 44263Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:43995*, 44263 Related Case(s): 44071 , 44263 , 48318 , 52188 , 58238 , 62541 , 63578 , 64102 , 64193 , 67636
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193728Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/14/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/24/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17733
10/15/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19152
10/18/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed on October 11, 2004. Due Date: 10 days
10/26/2004Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk. The request for the Judgment of Conviction filed on October 11, 2002 is for the co-defendant Aaron Daniels, not the appellant, Natasha Barker. As of this date, no judgment of conviction has been filed Natasha Barker. 04-19749
11/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9. 04-21122
11/24/2004MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals under Case Number 43995. Nos. 43995/44263-cases are not consolidated. 04-21630
11/29/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 3, 4, 5, 2004 and October 4, 2004. To Court Reporter: Dept. 6. 04-21700
12/14/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Judgment of Conviction, Granting Motion to Consolidate Appeals, and Setting Briefing Schedule. Docket No. 43995 is an appeal from a judgment of conviction. Docket No. 44263 is an appeal from a district court order denying a motion for a new trial in the same district court case. To date, this court has not received a certified copy of the judgment of conviction. The district court's docket entries indicate that it entered a written judgment of conviction for appellant Natasha Barker on November 16, 2004. The district court clerk shall transmit two certified copies of the judgment of conviction to this court within 10 days from the date of this order. Appellant has filed a motion to consolidate these appeals. Because these appeals involve the same parties and arise from the same underlying criminal case, we grant the motion. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. On October 15, 2004, appellant filed a docketing statement in Docket No. 43995. That docketing statement also addresses the appeal in Docket No. 44263. Additionally, on November 29, 2004, appellant filed a request for transcripts in Docket No. 43995, which requests the transcripts for the trial and the hearing on the motion for a new trial. Accordingly, appellant shall not be required to file a separate docketing statement or request for transcripts in Docket No. 44263. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix in these consolidated appeals by January 24, 2005. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 43995/44263. 04-22814
12/20/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of judgment of conviction filed in district court on November 16, 2004. Nos. 43995/44263 04-23196
01/24/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 23, 2005. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-01490
02/24/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-03716
02/24/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-03717
03/01/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 3, 4, and 5, 2004. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-04022
04/01/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 4, 2005. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-06439
04/06/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-06719
04/06/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-06720
04/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Court reporter Tom Mercer shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcript of proceedings held on October 4, 2004. If more time is needed Mr. Mercer shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Mr. Mercer, shall notify this court in writing, of this fact. Nos. 43995/44263. (05-07578) 05-07578
05/19/2005Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. Nos. 43995/44263.
06/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. To date, Mr. Mercer has not filed the October 4, 2004, transcript. Mr. Mercer shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Mr. Mercer shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Mr. Mercer shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. We caution Mr. Mercer that failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Nos. 43995/44263. 05-11520
06/20/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 4, 2004. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. Nos. 43995/44263. (filed in 43995) 05-12047
07/14/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 43995/44263. (05-14018) 05-14018
07/14/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 43995/44263.
11/28/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment and the order of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH. Nos. 43995/44263. 05-23200
12/23/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-23442
12/23/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2005. 05-23442