judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7931
B-7931
09/28/1978
MISC PETITION
AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY
MCDONALD RESPONDENTS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/07/1978Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/30/1978Supplemental Brief filedRelator
10/16/1978Reply to ResponseRelator
09/29/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/1978Reply to Response
10/30/1978Supplemental Brief filed
10/16/1978Reply to Response
10/09/1978Response to Motion filed
09/29/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/28/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Amoco Production CompanyRelator
McDonald Respondents, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information