judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIVERO (DAMIEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43989
Short Caption:RIVERO (DAMIEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0308048Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17673
09/23/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 13-14, 2004. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. Filed in district court on: not file-stamped. 04-17674
10/08/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 13, 14, 2004. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 04-18722
10/26/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 9, 2004. 04-19772
11/03/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-20264
11/03/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.
11/24/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: December 2, 2004. 04-21539
12/01/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21942
03/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-04175
03/29/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04685
03/29/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/18/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 7, 2005. 05-04685