judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNER (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47855
Short Caption:KENNER (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50441 , 50811
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR052770Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17117
08/21/2006MotionFiled Motion for Stay. of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Jurisdictional Question. 06-17339
08/29/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to stay these proceedings pending this court's determination of a jurisdictional question. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are hereby suspended until further order of this court. 06-17969
09/12/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-18821
10/10/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20644
10/10/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/19/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2006. 06-20644