judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (ERICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47856
Short Caption:BROWN (ERICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42273 , 44588 , 47071 , 60197 , 64443 , 64622 , 64907 , 64992 , 65690 , 68072 , 68554 , 75753 , 76588 , 76789
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189658Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17123
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 06-17277
08/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed on August 16, 2006. Due Date: 10 days
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on August 16, 2006. 06-17796
08/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 06-18047
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 06-18132
09/01/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on August 16, 2006. (submitted by attorney Michael Cristalli) 06-18200
10/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Fast Track Statement due: 10 days. 06-21964
10/31/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-22229
11/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 10/31/06. If counsel for appellant filed a rough draft transcript request form in the district court, counsel for appellant is directed to file 2 copies of that rough draft transcript request form and proof of service as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3) in this court within 5 days of this order. If counsel for appellant did not file a rough draft transcript request form in the district court, counsel is ordered to file such a request form within 5 days of this order, Appellant shall file 2 copies of the transcript request form and proof of service in this court within 10 days of this order. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts in this appeal in which to file the fast track statement and appendix 06-22787
11/21/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Filing of Ex Parte Motion for Request of Rough Draft Transcripts with the District Court of Clark County, Nevada. 06-23831
11/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (Notice of Filing of Ex Parte Motion for Request of Rough Draft Transcripts with the District Court of Clark County, Nevada.) Due date: 10 days.
12/01/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 06-24606
01/08/2007TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/26/06, 6/27/06, 6/28/06, 6/29/06, 6/30/06. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 07-00443
02/26/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 07-04562
03/15/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File a 15 Page Fast Track Statement of Appeal and 4 Page Errata to Fast Track Statement Bringing the Total Length to 15 Pages. 07-06048
03/30/2007MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 18 Page Fast Track Response. 07-07233
04/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 15, 2007 and March 30, 2007. The clerk shall file the fast track statement provisionally submitted on March 9, 2007, and the fast track appendix provisionally submitted on March 15, 2007/ The clerk shall file the fast track response provisionally submitted on March 30, 2007. 07-08646
04/17/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-05648
04/17/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Appellant's Errata to Fast Tack Statement Appeal from Judgment of Conviction. 07-06050
04/17/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 07-06053
04/17/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-07234
08/20/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Supplement Defendant's Fast Track Appeal Pursuant to Anders v. California. 07-18334
09/11/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to supplement the fast track statement. 07-19984
09/13/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. 07-20216
10/09/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-20380
10/09/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/17/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2007. 07-20380
03/20/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Recall Remittitur. 18-10727
03/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to recall the remittitur. The motion is denied. 18-12043
04/13/2018OtherReturned Unfiled Proper Person Document - "Petition for Panel Rehearing". 18-14221