judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANCHEZ VS. WAL-MART STORES

Case Information: 47851
Short Caption:SANCHEZ VS. WAL-MART STORESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A492246Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/25/2006 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/02/2009 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/02/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckely firm - check no. 215699.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17060
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
08/24/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
08/25/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18294
09/28/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement conference program. 06-19919
09/29/2006Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-19970
10/10/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-20701
10/10/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. 06-20755
10/17/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Heidi Parry Stern of Beckley Singleton. Stephen K. Lewis of Patti & Sgro is co-counsel for appellants. 06-21298
10/26/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-21990
10/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 06-22076
11/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Allowing Appeal to Proceed. As the district court has now complied with NRCP 54(b), we conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Consistent with the order entered on September 29, 2006, appellants opening brief and appendix shall be filed and served no later than December 28, 2006. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-23202
11/30/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Laxalt & Nomura. 06-24533
12/04/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule. 06-24711
12/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Opening Brief. Opening brief and appendix due: January 16, 2007. 06-25465
01/18/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. 07-01275
01/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: March 2, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-01405
03/05/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 38 pages. 07-05234
03/05/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-05237
03/05/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. 07-05238
03/29/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Brief due: May 4, 2007. 07-07072
04/02/2007MotionFiled Motion. Respondent, Walgreen Co.'s Joinder to Motion for an Order Extending Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Initial Request). 07-07307
04/05/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the relief requested in Walgreen's joinder to Wal-Mart's extension motion to extend the time to file the answering brief on behalf of all respondents. All respondents shall have until May 4, 2007, to file and serve their answering briefs. 07-07605
04/19/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Long's Drug Store's Answering Brief. 07-08819
05/02/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Motion for an Order Extending Time to file Respondents' Answering Brief (Second Request-Two Weeks.) (Respondent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) 07-09743
05/07/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Walgreen Co.'s Answering Brief. 07-10130
05/23/2007BriefFiled Joinder to Brief. Respondent CVS Pharmacy joins in Respondent Walgreen Co.'s Answering Brief. 07-11371
05/24/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Extending time to file Answering Brief. Respondent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. has moved on behalf of itself and respondents CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite-Aid, Albertson's Inc., and Lam's Pharmacy, Inc., to file a joint answering brief. These respondents shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a joint answering brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-11536
06/04/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Wal-Mart, CVS, Rite Aid, Albertson's and Lam's Pharmacy. 07-12141
06/04/2007BriefFiled Brief. Declaration in Support of Rewpondents' Answering Brief. 07-12188
07/09/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 4, 2007. 07-14913
08/08/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (second request) 07-17417
08/13/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Reply Brief due: September 4, 2007. 07-17745
09/06/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60 days) 07-19601
09/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until November 5, 2007, to file and serve the reply brief. 07-21168
10/30/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Marquis & Aurbach representing appellant as co-counsel. 07-23793
10/30/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-23794
12/05/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's: 5 days to file the reply brief. 07-26276
12/07/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-26599
01/17/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel Under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42. 08-01313
01/23/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Mr. Rothrock's Rule 42 Motion. 08-01723
02/01/2008MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion to Submit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Associate Counsel Under Nevda Supreme Court Rule 42 or, in the Alternative, Motion to Obtain Leave of Court to Re-File its Motion to Associate. 08-02660
02/13/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Daniel F. Polsenberg requesting that Beckley Singleton, Chtd., not Lewis and Roca, LLP, be be reflected as the firm name as counsel of record for appellants. Changed firm name back to Beckley Singleton, Chtd., per TL. 08-03512
02/13/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Daniel F. Polsenberg re: use of Beckley Singleton firm name in this case. 08-03535
02/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Michal S. Echols, Esq. returning his document entitled "Appellants' Opposition to Wal-Mart's Motion to Submit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Associate Counsel Under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42 and Opposition to Alternative Motion to Obtain Leave of Court to Refile Motion to Associate". 08-04066
02/27/2008MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion to File Leave to File Late Appellants' Opposition to Wal-Mart's Motion to Submit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Associate Counsel Under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42 and Opposition to Alternative Motion to Obtain Leave of Court to Refile Motion to Associate. 08-04793
02/27/2008MotionReceived Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Wal-Mart's Motion to Submit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Associate Counsel under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42 and Opposition to Alternative Motion to Obtain Leave of Court to Refiled Motion to Associate. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 03/19/08). 08-04794
02/29/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. We grant the motion to associate. Mr. Rothrock shall be permitted to appear on behalf of Wal-Mart in this appeal. fn2[Respondents's motion for leave to file a reply is denied as moot.] 08-05122
02/29/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Respondent Albertson's Inc. dba Sav-on Pharmacy. 08-05218
03/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion as Moot. The clerk shall return, unfiled, appellants' opposition, provisionally received on February 27, 2008. 08-06775
03/19/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Opposition to Wal-Mart's Motion to Submit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Associate Counsel under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42 and Opposition to Alternative Motion to Obtain Leave of Court to Refiled Motion to Associate. 08-04794
04/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Defendant Wal-Mart Store's Notice of Unavailabilty of Counsel. 08-10113
06/26/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Filing Document. The clerk shall file the "Supplement to Appellants' Opening Brief" received on June 17, 2008. Respondents shall have ten days from the date of this order to file any response. 08-16414
06/26/2008BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplement to Appellant's Opening Brief. 08-15400
07/07/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Motion for an Order Extending Time to File Respondent's Response to Appellant's Supplement to Their Opening Brief (Initial Request). 08-17119
07/21/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Respondent's response to the supplement to appellants' opening brief due: September 8, 2008. 08-18681
09/08/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents' Response to Supplement to Appellants' Opening Brief 08-23099
09/08/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Declaration in Support of Respondents' Response to Supplement to Appelllants' Opening Brief. 08-23103
09/10/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Respondent, Walgreen Co.'s Joinder to Walmart Stores, Inc's Response to Supplement to Appellants' Opening Brief. 08-23365
09/15/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Henderson Horizon CVS, LLc, Improperly Pled as CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Joinder to Walmart Stores Inc.'s Response to Supplement to Appellants' Opening Brief. 08-23722
09/16/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Respondent Longs Drug Stores Co.'s Joinder to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Response to Supplement to Appellants' Opening Brief. 08-23816
09/22/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Notice of Change of Address for Laxalt & Nomura (effective 10/01/08).
02/02/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on March 2, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) 09-02837
02/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 09-04089
03/02/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/10/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Change Counsel to Withdraw Frank Rothrock Under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 46. 09-21897
09/10/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Change Counsel to Withdraw Associated Counsel Frank C. Rothrock Under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 46. 09-21898
09/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw as Associated Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to remove attorney Frank C. Rothrock as associated counsel for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. 09-22485
12/24/2009Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, James W.. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Dissent: Cherry/Saitta. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. EN BANC. 09-31216
01/19/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-00071
01/19/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/27/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2010. 10-00071
02/04/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Publishers re: corrections to opinions filed in 2009. Nos.49008, 52110, 49029, 53596/54238, 51941, 49417, 50497, 51162, 47851 10-03343