judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRAN VS. NEV. POWER CO.

Case Information: 47850
Short Caption:TRAN VS. NEV. POWER CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A469931Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/14/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kerr & Associates - check no. 5330.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17036
08/16/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days.
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/31/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18119
09/07/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18474
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-20449
10/12/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Case Appeal Statement. Case appeal statement due: 10 days. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-20917
10/19/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-21544
11/03/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 3 and 4, 2006. To Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 06-22478
11/07/2006MotionFiled Motion. Request of Respondent to Supplement Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 06-22740
11/20/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplement to Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 12, 2004 and November 23, 2004. To Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 06-23685
12/08/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/12/04; 11/23/04; 4/3/06; and 4/4/06. Court Reporter: Angela K. Lee. 06-25149
01/17/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 16, 2007. 07-01225
02/20/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. 07-03996
02/22/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed 2/20/07. Opening brief due: 5 days. 07-04210
03/01/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-04952
03/01/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 07-04953
03/28/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 2, 2007. 07-07050
05/02/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-09850
05/02/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 07-09851
06/08/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 18, 2007. 07-12541
06/21/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. 07-13524
06/27/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. The clerk shall file the Reply Brief received on June 26, 2007. 07-14010
06/27/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-13910
10/30/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Attorney's Lien. STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 11/15/07. 07-23817
11/15/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel must pursue the enforcement of his attorney's lien in the first instance in the district court. The clerk shall strike the notice of attorney's lien filed on October 30, 2007. 07-24859
03/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-06431
03/14/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/07/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 08-11306
05/29/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Robert E. Glennen as counsel for appellant. 08-13562
05/29/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Tran's Motion to Extend Time to File Rehearing Motion. 08-13565
06/10/2008MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for Attorney Fees on Appeal. 08-14706
06/27/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant Tran's Opposition to Respondent's Attorney Fee Motion. 08-16519
06/30/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, appellant's petition for rehearing received on May 27, 2008. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel and shall address concerns relating to this appeal to counsel of record.On May 29, 2008, appellant's counsel filed a motion to extend time to file the petition for rehearing. The motion is granted. Counsel shall have 7 days to file and serve the petition for rehearing. Fn1 [. . .The clerk of this court shall remove from the docket, as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal, Mr. Kerr and the law firm of Ashworth and Kerr.] 08-16577
07/11/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Appellant). 08-17863
07/11/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. 08-17866
07/21/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Nhu Thi Tran - check no. 1425.
07/24/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Appellant has failed to establish a basis for rehearing and we therefore deny her petition." We also deny respondent's motion for attorney fees. 08-19107
08/19/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-19860
08/19/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/26/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 21, 2008. 08-19860