judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PONCIANO (EDGAR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47847
Short Caption:PONCIANO (EDGAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50787
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221173Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-16979
08/15/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/18/06, 6/8/06, 6/12/06, 6/13/06 and 7/18/06. Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt, Jackie Nelson and Bill Nelson. Filed in district court on: August 9, 2006. 06-16980
08/21/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 18, 2006. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. 06-17354
09/07/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/8/06; 6/12/06; 7/18/06. Court Reporter: Jackie Nelson. 06-18460
09/07/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/13/06. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 06-18461
09/28/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-19925
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 28, 2006. Court reporter or recorder Jackie Nelson shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days. Fast track statement and appendix due: 20 days from the filing of the transcripts. 06-20622
10/20/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 8, 2006. Court Reporter: Jackie Nelson. 06-21620
11/08/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-22804
11/15/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: 5 days. 06-23387
11/15/2006MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Ponciano's Motion for Leave to file 16-Page Fast Track Statement. 06-23425
11/15/2006Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 06-23426
11/20/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 16-page fast track statement and appendix received on November 15, 2006. Fast track response due: 20 days. 06-23690
11/20/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-23426
11/20/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-23427
12/08/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-25112
03/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-05576
04/03/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-07157
04/03/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/12/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2007. 07-07157