judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLIND PATTERSON V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 89-AA-0193
Short Caption:CHARLIND PATTERSON V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/02/1989

Opening Event Date:03/02/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/21/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/31/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCharlind Patterson NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Michael A. MilweeNN
RespondentJohn Doe N
N. Denise Wilson-Taylor YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PATTERSON, CHARLIND D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES
03/02/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989PETITION FOR REVIEW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & (MICHAEL A. MILWEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD DSA
03/21/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/21/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD R
04/28/1989PETITIONER'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BA
06/08/1989ORDER ORDERED APLE BRF BE FILED IN 20 DAYS OR CASE CALENDARED ON APLT BRF ALONE. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD BE
06/30/1989RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 6/8/89 & FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 062889 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/18/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/20/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 31, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD BE
07/31/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/22/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989ORDER BRF OF RESP DUE IN 10 DAYS;NFX DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD OPA
09/13/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD BE
09/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD OPA
10/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/31/1989RESPONDENT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR LV TO FL BE; GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 102689 SCHPRD V
10/31/1989PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/28/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWFEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/23/1990MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF DECISION DATED 4/12/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1990ORDER DENY PETNR'S MO FOR RECONSID GW PANELNWFEFA SCDATE 042590 SCHPRD VS
06/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIDATED 8-3-90 IN SUPREME COURT #90-5356 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD