judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO DAY

Case Information: 47853
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO DAYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D173163Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17112
08/24/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-17584
08/24/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Ex Parte Motion for Transcript/Order for Production of Transcript - Clark County Legal Services Program. Trancripts Requested: 7/25/06 and 8/1/06. 06-17627
08/24/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy - Ex parte Motion for Transcript/Order for Production of Transcript - Shelly Ajoub. 06-17628
09/07/2006Other Other. Filed Transcript of Proceedings July 25, 2006 and August 1, 2006 (SEALED) - not certified. Submitted by the Clark County District Attorney's Office. 06-18508
09/07/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Transcripts. 06-18511
11/07/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-22711
11/07/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-22712
12/01/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-24602
12/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: 60 days. 06-25225
02/12/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand to the District Court. 07-03380
05/01/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand Pursuant to Huneycutt Certification. We grant respondent's 2/12/07 unopposed motion. Report due: 30 days. Briefing suspended. 07-09675
07/23/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. To date, respondent has failed to file such a status report. Status report due: 10 days from the date of this order. 07-15987
08/06/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 07-17217
08/06/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 07-17219
09/28/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. "In light of the forgoing and cause appearing, this appeal dismissed." SNP08-JH/JP/JD. 07-21438
10/04/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.