judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IGNASIAK VS. CLARK CO. DEP'T OF AVIATION

Case Information: 47852
Short Caption:IGNASIAK VS. CLARK CO. DEP'T OF AVIATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A515363Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Scott R. Schreiber - check no. 2399.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17108
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/30/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18027
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20467
11/17/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-23655
12/11/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-25301
12/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-26691
12/29/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.