judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALES (NEAL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47848
Short Caption:SALES (NEAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213893Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/21/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-16986
08/15/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 24 through May 26, 2006. To Court Reporter: M. Cook and L. Makowski. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 06-16988
09/08/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
09/22/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-19506
01/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant: 20 days to file the opening brief and appendix and 7 days from to provide this court with proof of service of the transcript request form. We caution appellant's counsel that failure to comply with this court's order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Ms. Howard shall have 20 days file the requested transcripts. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, Ms. Howard shall within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Howard shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript form is attached to this order.] 07-01203
02/09/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-03342
02/15/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-03791
03/07/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court reporter shall have seven days from the date of this order to file and serve transcripts conducted on May 24-26, 2006. We elect to waive appellant's requirement of providing this court with proof of service of the transcript request form. Opening brief and appendix due: 50 days. 07-05367
03/08/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/25/06 and 5/26/06. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 07-05498
03/22/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Sharon Howard in response to the order filed on March 7, 2007. 07-06526
05/01/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-09710
05/01/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 07-09712
05/15/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. On March 22, 2007, the court received a letter from Ms. Howard regarding the proceedings of May 24, 2006. Jury selection took place on May 24, 2006, and appellant's attorney has informed her that these proceedings need not be transcribed. Ms. Howard has fulfilled the requirements of this court's order of March 7, 2007. 07-10799
06/06/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-12342
06/06/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 07-12343
06/06/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Exhibits. 07-12344
06/11/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed to transmit exhibit. Exhibit 7 due: 15 days. 07-12655
07/13/2007Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
08/21/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-18469
08/21/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/16/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. 07-22874
11/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Exhibits: State's Exhibit: 7 (videotape) returned this day. 07-24590
11/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/03/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 15, 2007. 07-24590