judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STANKIC (STEFAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43996
Short Caption:STANKIC (STEFAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44173 , 44591 , 48646
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C188702Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/24/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17735
10/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log. The attorney general shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the notice of appeal log maintained at the prison indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered to a prison official his notice of appeal. If the notice of appeal log does not indicate that appellant delivered this notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall inform this court of this fact. 04-18464
10/13/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Heather D. Procter of the Attorney General's office as counsel for respondent. 04-18995
11/03/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court Order. 04-20282
11/16/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal. Having reviewed the documents on file in this proper person appeal, this court has concluded that its review of the complete record is warranted. Accordingly, the clerk of the district court shall have 60 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). 04-21073
12/21/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-23222
12/21/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/18/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. The record before this court does not contain the transcript of the district court hearing held on July 21, 2004. If the transcript has been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed within which to transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 05-00968
03/07/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County District Court Clerk in response to order filed January 18, 2005. 05-04430
03/30/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 21, 2004. Court Reporter: Julie M. Lever. 05-06275
05/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarrnted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn26[We have considered all proper person documents and conclude that no relief based on those submissions is warranted.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-08703
05/31/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-08836
05/31/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. on May 25, 2005, appellant submitted a letter titled "RE: Illegal Incarceration" in which he appears to challenge a procedure of the parole board. To whatever extent appellant requests relief from this court in this letter, the request is improperly presented and is hereby denied. 05-11242
06/27/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 2, 2005. 05-08836