judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DIST. CT. (JD & T ENTERPRISES)

Case Information: 43991
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (JD & T ENTERPRISES)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0400593Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Certiorari/Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/12/2005 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/12/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/24/2004Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 04-17679
09/24/2004Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. 04-17680
10/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 04-18747
11/02/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Answer to Writ Petition). 04-20210
11/15/2004MotionFiled Motion. Supplemental Request for an Extension of Time to file answer (supplement to 11/02/04). 04-20988
11/17/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have until November 29, 2004, to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 04-21207
11/24/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request for an Extension of Time (Second Request). 04-21634
12/03/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 24, 2004. The real parties in interest shall have until December 10, 2004, to file and serve their answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 04-22103
12/09/2004Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 04-22526
12/09/2004AppendixFiled Appendix. Brief of Respondents and Real Parties in Interest in Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 04-22528
01/11/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Deputy A.G. John McGlamery 05-00581
07/06/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on September 12, 2005, at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc)
08/31/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/12/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Brief of Respondents and Real Parties in Interest in Opposition to the Petition for Writ. 05-17973
09/12/2005BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Supplemental Authorities for Supreme Court Oral Arguments on 12 September 2005. (Filed per oral order of the Court at argument.) 05-17975
09/12/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC
12/08/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC-NB/RR/WM/MG/MD/JH/RP 05-24000
01/03/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-00025
01/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.