judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 47886

Case Information: 47885
Short Caption:CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 47886Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:47885*, 47886 Related Case(s): 42123 , 46012 , 46683 , 50487 , 53486 , 53656
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030888Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/13/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17392
09/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18221
10/13/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-21112
10/13/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/30/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn15[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC. Nos. 47885/47886 07-02282
02/27/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04359
02/27/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/05/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2007. 07-04359