judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER (TYRONE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47875
Short Caption:WALKER (TYRONE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37863 , 38287 , 40017 , 55044 , 55662 , 55735
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C169019Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/16/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17290
08/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Specific Performance of Guilty Plea filed on August 16, 2006. Due Date: 10 days
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Specific Performance of Guilty Plea filed in district court on August 16, 2006. 06-17793
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18553
10/16/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 6. 06-21212
10/16/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/22/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. State shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this matter should not be remanded to the district court for further proceedings. 06-26228
01/17/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 07-01186
02/01/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn3[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-02572
02/28/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04393
02/28/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/14/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2007. 07-04393