Case Information: 90-CF-0461 | |||
Short Caption: | CURTIS N. CAMPBELL V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related |
Lead: | 90-CF-0461 | Consolidated: | 90-CF-0664 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F7043-89 | Filed Date: | 04/10/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/10/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/22/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/25/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/11/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 05/07/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Curtis N. Campbell | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CAMPBELL, CURTIS N. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 6/12/90 ORD: SUA SPONTE CONSOL NOTE - 01 90-461 & 90-664; APPOINTING NOTE - 02 BETH GOODMAN, ESQ., TO REPRE- NOTE - 02 SENT APLT IN BOTH CASES; NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO FILE DOCKETING STMT NOTE - 03 IN 90-664 W/IN 10 DAYS; BRF OF NOTE - 04 APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 04 COMPLETE RECORDS ARE FILED. NOTE - 05 CON 90-664 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 10/26/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 06 BY 12/21/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 07 BY 01/25/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 07 02/13/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 08 APRIL 1991 CAL; NFX NOTE - 08 | |||
04/10/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/26/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETH GOODMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/07/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD DSA | |||
05/16/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL (22 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD R | |||
05/22/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (201 PGS - BREMEN) JB (SEE RECORD IN 90-664 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/12/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/22/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (IN 90-664) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/16/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 082290 SCHPRD RT | |||
08/22/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/22/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (231 PGS - BURNS) JT PANEL SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD RT | |||
10/26/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 08 FOR ADVANCED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 090590 SCHPRD GR | |||
12/21/1990 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122190 SCHPRD BA | |||
01/25/1991 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/25/1991 | APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 012591 SCHPRD BE | |||
04/11/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/11/1991 | SUBMITTED PANELSCFARY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/16/1991 | VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART MOJ AF/VA IN PART TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELSCFARY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/16/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - VAAF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
05/07/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |