judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HONG (SUNG) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47876
Short Caption:HONG (SUNG) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0501599HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/12/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17291
09/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18223
10/12/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-21012
10/12/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court did not err in dismissing appellant's motion for the reasons stated in the attached order. Therefore, briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07B-NB/JH/RP 06-25418
12/20/2006Other Returned Mail. Order of Affirmance, addressed to Sung Hong returned. No forwarding address.
01/09/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00589
01/09/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/12/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 10, 2007. 07-00589
02/02/2007Other Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to Sung Hong re-mailed to corrected address.