Case Information: 89-AA-0287 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHN DUCKETT V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 03/24/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/24/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/28/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Duckett | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DUCKETT, JOHN D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES (WORMAN'S COMP.) | |||
01/01/1906 | OCHSMANJ FOR: SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO. | |||
03/24/1989 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/24/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES (WORKMAN'S COMP.) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/28/1989 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/29/1989 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/11/1989 | ORDER DIRG PTNR, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FL DSA OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/13/1989 | NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE OF SEARS ROEBUCK & COMPANY ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/17/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 042189 SCHPRD DSA | |||
06/27/1989 | ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FILE RECORD FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/28/1989 | ORDER RESP TO FL REC IN 15 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071589 SCHPRD R | |||
10/02/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/16/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
10/16/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO OF PTNR TO DISMISS & CASE IS DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD X | |||
10/16/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
10/19/1989 | RECEIVED APLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RECORD & RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/24/1989 | ORDER DENY MO OF RESP FOR LV TO FL REC AS MOOT, CASE HAVING BEEN DISMISSED BY 10/16 ORD. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/28/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |