judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON (TERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47859
Short Caption:JOHNSON (TERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C183985Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/10/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17130
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18547
10/10/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-20670
10/10/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-26127
01/16/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00929
01/16/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/22/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 18, 2007. 07-00929