judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAMPSCH VS. DIST. CT. (ORTEGA) C/W 47562

Case Information: 47865
Short Caption:HAMPSCH VS. DIST. CT. (ORTEGA) C/W 47562Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 47562 *, 47865Related Case(s): 47562
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 04P053495EClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis firm - check no. 3991.
08/17/2006Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Affidavit of Sheri M. Schwartz Pursuant to N.R.S. 34.170. 06-17221
08/18/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Service on District Judge and District Court Motion including exhibits.Due Date: 10 days.
08/21/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 10, 2006. Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 06-17369
08/29/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Certificate of Service of; 1. Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Affidavit of Sheri M. Schwartz Pursuant to N.R.S. 34.170 and 2. Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appeal Should not be Dismissed for Lack of Jurisdiction. 06-17927
08/29/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 06-17928
11/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Cases and Setting Briefing Schedule. On the same date that appellants filed their response to the order to show cause, they also filed a petition for a writ of mandamus. We conclude that the appeal in No. 47562 may proceed, but that consolidation is warranted. We consolidate this appeal and writ proceeding. Appellants/petitioners shall have 60 days to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. We invite the Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada to submit an amicus brief. Should the Section elect to participate in this matter, we request that it file and serve its amicus brief within 75 days from the date of this order. fn4[Appellants filed a transcript request form for the proceedings in district court on April 10, 2006, in No. 47562. This court filed that transcript on August 21, 2006 in No. 47865.] Nos. 47562/47865. (06-23598)
01/17/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 15, 2007. Nos. 47562/47865 (07-01182).
02/12/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 47562/47865. (07-03410)
04/09/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Order Dismissing Appeal and Writ Petition. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal and writ petition are dismissed." fn1[As the appeal and writ petition were consolidated on November 17, 2006, by order of this court, the stipulation is treated as a stipulation to dismiss the appeal and the writ petition.] The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK. Nos. 47562/47865 07-07902
04/09/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued.