Case: 17-0671
17-0671
08/23/2017
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
RADIANT FINANCIAL, INC.
FAYE BAGBY; BAGBY INVESTMENTS, LP; AND AMERICAN FINANCIAL & RETIREMENT SERVICES, LLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/23/2017 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Radiant Financial, Inc. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/18/2018 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
12/08/2017 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
09/12/2017 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
09/06/2017 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Faye Bagby, et al. | ||||||
08/23/2017 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Radiant Financial, Inc. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/18/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
American Financial & Retirement Services, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Eric D. Pearson Ms. Julie K. Biermacher Mr. James Craig Orr Jr. Mr. Scott A. Shanes |
Radiant Financial, Inc. | Petitioner | Mr. Thomas L. Case Ms. Blair E. Brogan Mr. Jason Scott Lewis Mr. Jason P. Steed Mr. Jason M. Hopkins Ms. Kendyl Taylor Hanks Mr. Gregory Kelminson Ms. Elizabeth K. Stepp |
Bagby Investments, LP | Respondent | Mr. James Craig Orr Jr. |
Faye Bagby | Respondent | Mr. James Craig Orr Jr. |
Paladin Settlements, Inc. | Other interested party | Ms. Robbyn P. Wysocki |
Mosaic Management Group, Inc. | Other interested party | Ms. Robbyn P. Wysocki |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-16-00268-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 07-10-17
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable David J. Schenck
Trial Court Information
191st District Court
Honorable Gena Nicole Slaughter
DC-13-06046