Case: 07-92-00266-CV
07-92-00266-CV
08/10/1992
Certiorari
Zoning Board of Adjustment of the City of Lubbock, Texas
Humphrey, J. M.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/26/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/10/1993 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
02/19/1993 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
02/19/1993 | Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc. | | |
01/28/1993 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
01/28/1993 | Response to any order, inquiry or motion | | |
01/21/1993 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
01/07/1993 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered | |
12/03/1992 | Submitted | | |
12/03/1992 | Submission | | |
11/13/1992 | Submission | | |
11/01/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/29/1992 | Motion for Supplemental Brief Disposed | GRANT | |
09/17/1992 | Motion For Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
09/10/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
08/10/1992 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/10/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/26/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Zoning Board Of Adjustment Of | Appellant | Jean Shotts |
Humphrey, J. M. | Appellee | Bill Davis |
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable John R. McFall
91-532,541