Case: 05-92-01825-CV
05-92-01825-CV
08/12/1992
Mandamus
Heller, Glenda K.
Theo Bedard, Judge, 330th District Court, Dallas County, Tex
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/30/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
10/05/2004 | Order Entered | Destroy | | ||
07/01/2004 | Record Pickup | | |||
06/29/2004 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
08/12/1992 | MattConv | | |||
08/12/1992 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
08/12/1992 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
08/12/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
08/12/1992 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/28/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
08/12/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/05/2004 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
330th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Theo L. Bedard
90-6077-Y