Case: PD-0647-17
PD-0647-17
08/08/2017
PDR Case Type
SHELTON, ERIC LLOYD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/01/2017 | RETURNED TO COA -- 69.4 T.R.A.P |
| |||||
10/04/2017 | PDR DISP | Refused |
| ||||
08/25/2017 | COA RECORD RECEIVED | | |||||
08/08/2017 | PDR FILED |
| |||||
06/22/2017 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted |
| ||||
06/22/2017 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/01/2017 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SHELTON, ERIC LLOYD | Appellant | Michael Mowla |
STATE OF TEXAS | State |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-16-00173-CR
Affirmed
06-01-17
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
412th District Court
Brazoria
69746