judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ACRI VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34792
Short Caption:ACRI VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33599 , 35932
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385377Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mithcell Acri-Money Order # 84191829311.
09/08/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandate. 99-08474
09/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-08926
10/05/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-09557
10/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Correcting Clerical Error. We note that a clerical error was made in the caption of the order filed September 21, 1999. The order is hereby corrected to read as the caption appears on this order. "Washoe County Clerk" designated in the "cc" section is corrected to read "Clark County Clerk." Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve the respondent district judge and submit proof of such service with this court. 99-10483
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00543
02/08/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-01959
02/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.