judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

F.D. GRAYTON INCORPORATED V. DWAYNE A. JACKSON

Case Information: 10-AA-0987
Short Caption:F.D. GRAYTON INCORPORATED V. DWAYNE A. JACKSONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01199-10Filed Date:08/13/2010

Opening Event Date:08/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerF.D. Grayton IncorporatedN
Charles A. Ray, Jr.YY
RespondentDwayne A. Jackson NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/13/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/16/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
08/17/2010FILING FEE of $100
08/23/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
12/14/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/hearing 6/23/10
12/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/16/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
01/20/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 10 days.
02/07/2011RECEIVED- petitoner's brief and appendix
02/11/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is F/O that the brief of respondet shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
02/11/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
02/11/2011APPENDIX
03/23/2011 It appearing that the brief of petitioner was filed with this court on February 11, 2011, and the brief of respondent was due to be filed on or before March 14, 2011, but the brief has not yet been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or statement, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on petitioner's brief alone. (JAC)
04/22/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 23, 2011, which directed respondent to submit his brief within 20 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this petition for review shall be scheduled for consideration on the record and on the petitioner's brief alone. (ETW)
04/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/02/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, Ferren
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
05/18/2012FiledMandate