Case: 07-17-00326-CV
07-17-00326-CV
09/11/2017
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of A.G.D.M., a Child
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/10/2018 | Case stored | | |||||||
01/10/2018 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
12/27/2017 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
10/23/2017 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
10/22/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/17/2017 | Document filed | | |||||||
10/11/2017 | Response filed | | |||||||
09/26/2017 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
09/26/2017 | Affidavit filed | | |||||||
09/25/2017 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
09/20/2017 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
09/20/2017 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||||
09/11/2017 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||||
09/11/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
09/11/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
09/06/2017 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/10/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
McDaniel, Andrew | Appellant | Andrew McDaniel |
Jones, Stephenie Allyn | Appellee | Stephenie Allyn Jones |
Trial Court Information
72nd District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Stephen L. Johnson
2013-505,390
Vicki Laing