judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WADE C. WOOFORD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0996
Short Caption:WADE C. WOOFORD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-12726-09Filed Date:08/12/2010

Opening Event Date:08/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/11/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWade C. Wooford Y
Sicilia C. EnglertYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sicilia C. Englert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/23/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sicilia C. Englert, Esquire
09/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/07/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript.
11/24/2010RECORD INDEX
11/24/2010RECORD COPIES
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (exhibit B & C for the Government's oppo to defendants's motion to modify conditions of release filed 3/22/10
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (12pgs/McCarn) 5/3/10 proc.
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (188pgs/McCarn) 5/4/10 proc.
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD -#4 (pg. 189 - pg. 351/McCarn 5/5/10 proc.
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (94pgs/Maar) 5/10/10 proc.
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (18pgs/Maar) 5/11/10 proc.
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (19pgs/Tape) 7/19/10 proc. w/CD
11/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF tp 60 days. no oppo
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 11, 2011. (JAC)
03/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/11/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. (JAC)
04/21/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/21/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
05/11/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before June 13, 2011. (JAC)
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/11/2011FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Reid,Nebeker
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/04/2011FiledMandate
01/25/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
02/28/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)