Case: 05-12-00568-CV
05-12-00568-CV
04/30/2012
Interloctory
Institutional Securities Corporation and ISC Group, Inc
Vernon J. "Coby" Hood III
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/15/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
05/29/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/22/2013 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
12/12/2012 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in Part and Reversed and Remanded in Part |
| ||||
12/12/2012 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
10/23/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
10/19/2012 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/16/2012 | Motion for Oral Argument |
| |||||
09/17/2012 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||
06/28/2012 | Brief Due | | |||||
06/20/2012 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||||
06/15/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
06/15/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
05/29/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
05/29/2012 | Brief Due | | |||||
05/10/2012 | Record due | | |||||
05/09/2012 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
05/04/2012 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
05/02/2012 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
04/30/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
04/30/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
04/30/2012 | Letter Received | | |||||
04/30/2012 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||||
04/30/2012 | $175 filing fee due | | |||||
04/10/2011 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/22/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/12/2018 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vernon J. "Coby" Hood III | Appellee | Edward P. Quillin |
Institutional Securities Corporation and ISC Group, Inc | Appellant | J. Jeffrey Springer Donald H. Ray |
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 160th District Court
DC-12-03279-H
Sharron Rankin