judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Maron Thomas v. The State of Texas

Case: 01-13-00697-CR
01-13-00697-CR
08/14/2013
Capital Murder
Maron Thomas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/07/2014Mandate issued
09/04/2014Memorandum opinion issuedDismiss appeal
09/04/2014Judgment Issued
09/04/2014Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/04/2014Submitted
09/04/2014Case reinstated
08/14/2014Supplemental clerks record due
08/14/2014Hearing record due
08/13/2014Supplemental clerks record filed
08/11/2014Hearing record filed
08/07/2014Motion to dismiss filed
08/06/2014Notice filed
08/05/2014Supplemental clerks record filed
07/15/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/15/2014Order issuedAbated
07/02/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/02/2014Appellants brief due
07/02/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
06/03/2014Order enteredGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
06/02/2014Appellants brief due
05/30/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/03/2014Appellants brief due
02/24/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
02/24/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/12/2014Reporters record due
01/30/2014Reporters record filed
01/28/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/13/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed
01/06/2014Reporters record due
12/05/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
12/02/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
12/02/2013Reporters record due
11/12/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/04/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
10/29/2013Reporters record due
10/01/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/30/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/30/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
09/30/2013Reporters record due
09/27/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/26/2013Response due
09/20/2013Clerks record filed
09/13/2013Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2013Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/09/2013Telephone inquiry to or from the court
09/08/2013Court reporters information sheet sent
09/06/2013No reporters record filed in criminal case
09/06/2013No clerks record filed in criminal case
08/30/2013Court reporters information sheet sent
08/30/2013Record due
08/16/2013Letter issued by the court
08/14/2013Case began in court of appeals
08/14/2013Notice of appeal received
07/18/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
07/01/2013Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/2039RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBrandy N. Davidson (Robinson)
Travis J. Koehn
Thomas, MaronCriminal - AppellantPatrick F. McCann
Trial Court Information
155th District Court
Austin
Honorable Jeff R. Steinhauser
2010R-0010
Kaetheryne B. Kyriell