judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ARTHUR CODY GRAY a/k/a TOBIN McGUFFIN v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0143)
Case Number:S-07-0143Case Docketed On:07/05/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:ARTHUR CODY GRAY a/k/a TOBIN McGUFFIN v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:ARTHUR CODY GRAY a/k/a TOBIN McGUFFIN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantArthur Cody GrayDavid M. Gosar
AppellantTobin McGuffinDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionJohn William Renneisen
Kristi Marie Radosevich
Steven R. Czoschke
Bruce A. Salzburg
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Other, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 115
Citation:193 P.3d 246

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/05/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/05/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/22/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/03/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/22/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Internal - Veto of expedite recommendation.Notice-InternalVetoFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kristi Radosevich for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/21/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David M. Gosar for Appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David M. Gosar for appellant; Kristi M. Radosevich, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/03/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/13/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
10/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for attorney fees and expensesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/04/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/04/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/07/08 by H. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal