judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHANIEL O. ADDISON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0995
Short Caption:NATHANIEL O. ADDISON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-1423-10Filed Date:08/09/2010

Opening Event Date:08/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Karen Shinskie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Donald L. Dworsky, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/23/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Donald L. Dworsky, Esquire
09/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (69 pgs/tape) 4/23/10 proc.
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (65 pgs/Hunt) 4/26/10 proc.
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (392 pgs/Burr) 4/28-30/10 proc.
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (12 pgs/tape) 8/6/10 proc. w/cd
11/02/2010RECORD INDEX
11/02/2010RECORD COPIES
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED documents)
11/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/10/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the end of April. no oppo
12/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. (JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/25/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
05/26/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/07/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellee to supplement the record with the lodged document that was part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged document will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (JAC)
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (gvt exh 7 - radiology report---filed 4/29/10)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/01/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate
12/19/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)