Case: 07-14-00295-CV
07-14-00295-CV
07/31/2014
Suit affecting parent child relationship
Jacob Frank Ayala
Veronica Valdez Apodaca
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/17/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||
11/05/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/04/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
09/19/2016 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
07/18/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
08/11/2015 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/21/2015 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
12/17/2014 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
12/17/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
11/20/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||||
11/19/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
11/13/2014 | Record checked out | | |||||||
11/13/2014 | Letter filed | | |||||||
11/12/2014 | Motion disposed | Filing is Moot |
| ||||||
11/05/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
10/28/2014 | Motion filed | | |||||||
10/27/2014 | Motion filed | | |||||||
09/24/2014 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
09/22/2014 | Letter filed | | |||||||
08/25/2014 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
08/22/2014 | Hearing record filed |
| |||||||
08/18/2014 | Document filed | | |||||||
08/18/2014 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||||
08/06/2014 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
07/31/2014 | Affidavit of indigence for costs of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
07/31/2014 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
07/31/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
06/26/2014 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/04/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Office of the Attorney General | Appellee | Deterrean Gamble |
Ayala, Jacob | Appellant | Jacob Ayala |
Trial Court Information
222nd District Court
Deaf Smith
Honorable Roland D. Saul
DR08E082-A
Tracy McCall