judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOREMAN (FREDRICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45924
Short Caption:FOREMAN (FREDRICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212544Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-18265
11/15/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 05-22473
11/30/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 05-23492
11/30/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-23493
12/02/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of fast track statement. 05-23637
12/29/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 05-25373
02/09/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant the State's motion and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-02918
03/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-03936
03/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2006. 06-03936