judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HILL (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45944
Short Caption:HILL (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - CR30881Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-18429
10/17/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-20524
10/19/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal. 05-20754
11/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 17, 2005. Fast Track Statement or Motion to Withdraw this Appeal Voluntarily due: 30 days. 05-22178
12/05/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-23731
12/05/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-23733
12/27/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-25201
03/16/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-05664
04/11/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-06055
04/11/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/20/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 13, 2006. 06-06055