Case Information: 90-CF-0413 | |||
Short Caption: | OWEN HINKLE V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F9606-89 | Filed Date: | 04/02/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/02/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Owen Hinkle | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HINKLE, OWEN UNITED STATES | |||
04/02/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/19/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JUDITH L. WALTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/30/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD DSA | |||
06/01/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 060890 SCHPRD R | |||
07/31/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8-PGS/HART) AJ PANEL SCDATE 081090 SCHPRD RT | |||
10/23/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/06/1990 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
11/06/1990 | ORDER GRNT APLT MO TO DISMISS APPEAL AS A DUPLICATE CASE AND THIS IS HEREBY DISMISSED PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/06/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE |