judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAPRI (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45925
Short Caption:CAPRI (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40867 , 41220 , 42714 , 44318 , 44374 , 44611 , 44655 , 45437 , 45965 , 47649 , 48303 , 62990
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152948Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/04/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18267
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19508
11/04/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 05-21829
11/04/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-24858
01/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00507
01/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. 06-00507