Case Information: 90-CF-0414 | |||
Short Caption: | MILTON L. HAYWARD V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F8165-89 | Filed Date: | 04/05/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/05/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/22/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 01/28/1992 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Milton L. Hayward | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HAYWARD, MILTON L. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 6/28/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF CNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D TO EXTENT THAT NOTE - 02 APPMT OF DANIEL SCHEMBER IS NOTE - 02 VACATED & DAVID SITOMER IS NOTE - 03 APPTD FOR APLT; DENY MO TO VA- NOTE - 03 CATE 5/30/90 ORD: APLT TO FL NOTE - 04 DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 4/5/91 ORD: APLT BRF DUE NOTE - 05 6/12/91; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 06 7/17/91; REPLY BRF DUE 8/5/91; NOTE - 06 SCHED ON SEPT. 1991 CALENDAR | |||
01/01/1906 | SCHEMBERD VACATED 6/28/90 | |||
04/05/1990 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
04/19/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/30/1990 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/30/1990 | ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL DSA W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE MAY RESULT TO APPOINTMENT BEING VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD V | |||
06/01/1990 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR COURT TO VACATE ORDER OF 5-30-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/01/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD R | |||
06/28/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID J. SITOMER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/28/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
06/29/1990 | MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF THE COURT'S JUNE 28, 1990 ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/06/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD DSA | |||
08/10/1990 | RECEIVED CT RPTR FRANKLIN CERTIFICATION OF 9/21/89 PROC. (STATUS CONF ONLY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/13/1990 | ORDER GRANT MO OF DANIEL SCHEMBER FOR RECONSIDERATION & VACATE 5/30/90 ORDER. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 072090 SCHPRD TO | |||
08/22/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(177 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 081090 SCHPRD RT | |||
08/22/1990 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/27/1990 | ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 091290 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
10/25/1990 | STATEMENT OF APLT REPORT TO THE COURT REQUEST FOR STAY AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/14/1990 | ORDER DENYG APLT MO W/O PREJ TO ITS FILING OF AFORESAID MO IN TRL CRT & FL A COPY W/THIS CRT.GW PANELRO SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD TO | |||
01/11/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(ORDER JUDGE RYAN DATED 11-13-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/22/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(14 PGS/FRANKLIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 013091 SCHPRD RT | |||
04/05/1991 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-05. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022791 SCHPRD B | |||
05/20/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (6-PGS/PIRFO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/12/1991 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/03/1991 | ORDER PURST TO MO TO W/DRAW THIS CRT'S 4/5/91 ADV BRFG ORDER IS VACATED. PANELJWR SCDATE 040591 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
08/09/1991 | LETTER TO APLT RE CNSL REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL; RESPONSE TO ANDERS LTR DUE BY 9/9/91. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 080791 SCHPRD V | |||
01/07/1992 | AFFIRMED JMT GRANTING CNSL'S MO TO W/D & AFFIRMING THE ORD ON APPEAL. DAS PANELFESCKN SCDATE 123091 SCHPRD VS | |||
01/07/1992 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
01/07/1992 | AFFIRMED | |||
01/28/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |