judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIDDEL VS. DIST. CT. (STATE OF NEVADA)

Case Information: 42012
Short Caption:RIDDEL VS. DIST. CT. (STATE OF NEVADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42950
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192832Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 03-15156
09/10/2003Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 03-15157
09/10/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Donald J. Green regarding refund of filing fee.
09/12/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of party beneficially interested. Due Date: 10 days
09/15/2003Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix Exhibit No. 9 to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 03-15378
09/19/2003Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 03-15696
09/19/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn2[In light of this disposition, petitioner's request for a stay of the proceeding below is denied as moot.] NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-15698
10/14/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-15893
10/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.