Case Information: 91-CF-0889 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL LEONARD V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F5380-90 | Filed Date: | 07/30/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/30/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/16/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/24/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/09/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/02/1992 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Michael Leonard | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | LEONARD, MICHAEL a/k/a MICHAEL LENORD UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | ||||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CO DEF: RUSSELL SHEPPARD NOTE - 01 | |||
07/30/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/20/1991 | LETTER FROM APLT ASKING NAME OF HIS ATTY PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/21/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RALPH THOMAS MABRY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/18/1991 | ORDER APLT TO FL DSA W/IN 10 OR VACATE CJA APPT. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 091091 SCHPRD K | |||
09/27/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 093091 SCHPRD DSA | |||
10/16/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL W/64-PGS/CALHOUN AJ PANEL SCDATE 093091 SCHPRD R | |||
10/16/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
10/24/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (40-PGS/CRYSTAL 1/3/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/30/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (208 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100691 SCHPRD RT | |||
12/18/1991 | ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 & APLE BRF DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER AC PANELRBH SCDATE 103091 SCHPRD U | |||
02/05/1992 | ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE CJA ATTR. AC PANELRO SCDATE 013092 SCHPRD K | |||
02/21/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 021792 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/21/1992 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/27/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/27/1992 | ORDER GR MO OF APLT LV FL BRF, LODGED BA FILED. BRF OF APLE DUE BY 3/24/92. AC PANELRBH SCDATE 022492 SCHPRD K | |||
03/24/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
03/24/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
04/23/1992 | ORDER Deny motion of apellant to supplement the record on appeal without prejudice to filing the motion in the Superior Court. | |||
09/09/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/09/1992 | SUBMITTED (TE SC KG) | |||
09/11/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ (TE SC KG) | |||
10/02/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |