Case Information: 91-CF-0892 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIE LEE HOLTON V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F6010-90 | Filed Date: | 07/23/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/23/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/18/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/08/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/22/1993 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/19/1993 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Willie Lee Holton | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HOLTON, WILLIE LEE UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | NFX | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 9/5/91 ORD: GR MO OF CNSL FR NOTE - 01 APLT TO WITHDRAW; APMT OF NOTE - 02 LINDA SROUFE, ESQ IS VACATED; NOTE - 02 ATTY BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ NOTE - 03 IS APPTD TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 03 HEREIN; ATTY SROUFE TO TRANS NOTE - 04 ALL DOCS PERTAINING TO APPEAL NOTE - 04 TO NEWLY-APPTD CNSL; APLT TO NOTE - 05 FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 05 | |||
01/01/1906 | SROUFEL VACATED 9/5/91 | |||
07/23/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/19/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LINDA Y. SROUFE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1991 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/05/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/05/1991 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 082991 SCHPRD V | |||
09/13/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 091691 SCHPRD DSA | |||
10/18/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/18/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (239 PGS/TANNER) PROC. DTE. 5/20/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/18/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/02/1992 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE W/I 40 DAYS FR DTD OF ORD & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022492 SCHPRD B | |||
04/09/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
05/08/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/08/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
03/29/1993 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
06/22/1993 | SUBMITTED (ST,FA,KE) | |||
06/24/1993 | AFFIRMED MOJ (ST,FA,NW) | |||
07/19/1993 | MANDATE ISSUED |