judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AMIR D. COOPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 91-CF-0830
Short Caption:AMIR D. COOPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10078-90Filed Date:07/22/1991

Opening Event Date:07/22/1991Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/30/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/1992
Argued/Submitted:06/26/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/20/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAmir Demetrius Cooper N
Howard M. Groedel YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COOPER, AMIR D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
07/22/1991NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/30/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HOWARD GROEDEL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1991APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 080991 SCHPRD DSA
09/09/1991RECEIVED CERT. OF CRT RPTR TREMEL FOR PROC. OF 2/4/91 - RE: NOT WITH THIS JUDGE ON 7/25/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1991RECORD ON APPEAL W/137-PGS/VAN BREMEN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 092291 SCHPRD R
09/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (145-PGS/BURNS 2/20/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991RECORD COMPLETED
11/19/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/6/92 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 122491 SCHPRD BE
12/30/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/6/92; NFX. DAS PANELJAC SCDATE 122391 SCHPRD B
01/06/1992APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 010692 SCHPRD BE
01/06/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/24/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (34-PGS/BURNS 2/29/92 & 2/22/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT
05/20/1992STATEMENT OF APLT RE MAY 11, 1992 letter
05/28/1992appellant's motion to submit without argument
06/08/1992grant appellant's unopposed motion to submit without argument
06/26/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/26/1992SUBMITTED ST FA SU
06/29/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (ST FA SU)
07/20/1992MANDATE ISSUED