judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VACATION VILLAGE VS. FOOTHILL CAPITAL CORP.

Case Information: 42013
Short Caption:VACATION VILLAGE VS. FOOTHILL CAPITAL CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38010 , 41819 , 42164 , 43185 , 47511
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A426036Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ShearingCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Senior Justice ShearingPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/2003 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver.
09/10/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John Peter Lee--check no. 32106.
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15164
09/17/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/29/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16209
09/30/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Thomas J. Tanksley. (docketing statement)
10/01/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 03-16332
10/06/2003Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 03-16617
10/08/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. 03-16745
10/08/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-16769
10/08/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Response to Appellants' Docketing Statement. 03-16772
10/16/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Removing Appeals from Settlement Program. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement in these appeals. We remove these appeals from the court's settlement conference program. The time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs will remain stayed, however, pending resolution of respondent's motions to dismiss appeals. Nos. 41819/42013 - cases are not consolidated. 03-17186
11/06/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 41819 and 42013, and Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus in docket No. 42164. As we lack jurisdiction over these appeals, ' . . . we dismiss them.' fn7[Foothill's motions to dismiss are denied as moot.] We grant the petition insofar as it seeks mandamus relief, and we direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus compelling the district court to vacate its September 18, 2003 orders allowing the debtor examinations of petitioners Terrie Heers Thompson, Cathleen Heers Norcott, Cheryl Nolte, Gary Heers and Tim Heers. fn9[A writ of prohibition is not available here.] fn10[As to petitioners' request for reassignment of this case based on the district court mislabeling as final certain orders and judgments, we deny relief. In light of our issuance of extraordinary relief, we deny as moot petitioners' stay motion, and we vacate our temporary stay, entered on October 14, 2003, in Docket No. 42164.] NNP04S-NB/WM/MG. Nos. 41819/42013/42164 - cases are consolidated. 03-18508
12/02/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18652
12/02/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2003. 03-18652