Case Information: 91-CF-1135 | |||
Short Caption: | DERRICK G. TWYMAN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F13230-90 | Filed Date: | 09/26/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/26/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/24/1992 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/06/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/14/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/06/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Derrick G. Twyman | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TWYMAN, DERRICK G. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | ||||
09/26/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
10/04/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL A. SIGNET, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/16/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 101591 SCHPRD DSA | |||
12/19/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112991 SCHPRD R | |||
01/24/1992 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (326 PGS/SWARINGER) PROC. 6/3-5/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 123091 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
01/24/1992 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
02/25/1992 | ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 021492 SCHPRD GR | |||
04/06/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
05/06/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/06/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/17/1992 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
10/14/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/14/1992 | SUBMITTED RG KG NW | |||
10/16/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ (RG KG NW) | |||
11/06/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |